CHARLES AND JULIA HENRY FUND

Charity number: 1155582
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 09 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 09 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 23 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 23 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 26 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 26 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 03 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 03 April 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2015 14 March 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 14 March 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)