CHARLES AND JULIA HENRY FUND

Charity number: 1155582
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £165.56k £219.56k £245.22k £283.75k £271.22k
Total expenditure £169.32k £194.74k £212.47k £200.78k £215.67k