CHARLES AND JULIA HENRY FUND

Charity number: 1155582
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARC GOODHEART Trustee 31 May 2013 None on record
Dinah Rose QC Trustee 01 September 2020
THE COLLEGE OF ST MARY MAGDALEN IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD Charity reporting is up to date
Lord Smith of Finsbury Chair 01 January 2016
STEPHEN TINDALE CLIMATE ANSWERS Charity reporting is 31 days late
PEMBROKE COLLEGE CAMBRIDGE MISSION Charity reporting is up to date
PEMBROKE COLLEGE SETTLEMENT Charity reporting is up to date
ALBERT MEMORIAL COLLEGE Charity reporting is up to date
BRIDGET KENDALL Trustee 01 September 2020
THE MASTER (OR KEEPER) AND FELLOWS OF PETERHOUSE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE Charity reporting is up to date
Tom Fletcher CMG Trustee 01 September 2020 None on record
KIMBERLY GOFF-CREWS Trustee 31 May 2013 None on record
DAME FIONA REYNOLDS DBE Trustee 01 January 2016
ENGLISH CATHEDRALS FUND Charity reporting is up to date
INTERNATIONAL NATIONAL TRUSTS ORGANISATION Charity reporting is up to date
Lawrence Bacow Trustee 01 July 2018 None on record
Baroness Royall of Blaisdon Trustee 21 September 2017
THE PRINCIPAL AND FELLOWS OF SOMERVILLE COLLEGE Charity reporting is up to date
FULL FACT Charity reporting is up to date
PROFESSOR PETER SALOVEY Trustee 01 July 2013 None on record
Dean Marvin Chun Trustee 23 August 2017 None on record
Dean Rakesh Khurana Trustee 08 March 2016 None on record