Accounts and annual returns SIMON'S MANGO TREE LTD
Charity number: 1150473

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 09 July 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 July 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 July 2020 | 08 June 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 July 2019 | 08 June 2021 | 395 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 July 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 July 2018 | 29 August 2019 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 July 2018 | 29 August 2019 | 112 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window