CHALE RECREATION GROUND LTD

Charity number: 1150297
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £8.67k £11.14k £11.34k £13.95k £1.29k
Total expenditure £1.54k £4.22k £1.89k £2.44k £2.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A