BEDLINGTON COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1151177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

07 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 08 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 09 November 2017 On time Download