Accounts and annual returns ST PAUL'S CHILDREN'S PROJECT

Charity number: 1150487
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required