Financial history ST PAUL'S CHILDREN'S PROJECT

Charity number: 1150487
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £11.70k £14.12k £10.86k £13.29k £11.82k
Total expenditure £11.84k £14.12k £10.66k £16.14k £8.65k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A