ECOWORKS

Charity number: 1151903
Charity reporting is overdue by 3 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £34.57k £34.57k £65.39k £23.08k £17.99k
Total expenditure £31.52k £31.52k £29.51k £28.37k £35.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.17k £0 £0 N/A N/A