Accounts and annual returns BRISTOL METROPOLITAN ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1150335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 December 2019 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 17 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window