Trustees MALPAS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1150391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Leigh Raymond Ibbotson Chair 26 June 2020
None on record
James Derek Cable Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
Valerie Susan Mitchell Trustee 03 December 2021
None on record
John Henwood Trustee 26 August 2021
None on record
Benjamin Leach Trustee 26 August 2021
None on record
Margaret Ann Johnson Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Dr Angela Swift Trustee 26 June 2020
None on record
David Hugh James Trustee 20 November 2018
None on record
PETER CRAVEN Trustee 18 November 2013
None on record
RICHARD SELBY Trustee 09 November 2012
None on record