Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST SWITHUN'S SCHOOL

Charity number: 1150288
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 17 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 June 2022 349 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 28 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 28 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required