Trustees IMPERIAL COLLEGE UNION
Charity number: 1151241

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Stephen Michael Richardson | Chair | 03 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Coulson | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
In Hei Wong | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Xueqi Yuan | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samuel William Taylor Lovatt | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ang Li | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jason Zheng | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dylan Hughes | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Genevieve Landricombe | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Niamh Megan McAuley | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Drastich | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Wagner | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nathalie Podder | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michaela Flegrova | Trustee | 03 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Phil Power | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Dorothy Griffiths | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.