THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CHAD CHADWELL HEATH

Charity number: 1150077
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £252.01k £220.31k £167.46k £267.33k £287.01k
Total expenditure £215.80k £202.50k £177.08k £326.92k £309.53k
Income from government contracts £0 £15.00k £41.91k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £56.31k N/A