THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CHAD CHADWELL HEATH

Charity number: 1150077
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NICHOLAS PETER HALER Trustee 29 April 2018 None on record
Mark Harding Trustee 23 April 2017 None on record
ROBERT WILLIAM CROWTHER Trustee 27 November 2012
ACS DANCE CENTRE Received: On time
ANNE FOSTER Trustee 29 April 2018 None on record
Julian David Cartwright Trustee 27 April 2014 None on record
Jaqueline Elizabeth Charles Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
Joel Anthony Crowther Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
MRS MAGGIE WHIPP Trustee 27 November 2012 None on record
Rev CHRISTINE JOAN HARDING Trustee 27 November 2012 None on record
Judith Lesley Berry Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
Julie Court Trustee 23 April 2017 None on record
Rosanne Marie Green Trustee 29 April 2018 None on record
Raymond John Childs Trustee 27 April 2014 None on record
Councillor Ingrid Robinson Trustee 23 April 2017
BARKING AND DAGENHAM CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU Received: On time
Amaefule Young Osuji Trustee 29 April 2018 None on record
Rev MARTIN JOHN COURT Chair 27 November 2012 None on record
Fiona Roy Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
Rev Chika Felix Nduku Trustee 30 April 2017 None on record
Victoria Louise Burke Trustee 27 April 2014 None on record
Carol Welsby Trustee 23 April 2017 None on record