Trustees WOLVERHAMPTON YOUTH ZONE
Charity number: 1151247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Anne Butcher | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ashok Kumar Raju | Trustee | 03 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Budd | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Munro | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE JANE BASHFORD | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHERRY LOUISE KATE SWIFT | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Karen Cecilia Griffiths | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Benjamin | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Parveen Kumari Brigue | Trustee | 29 July 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.