Accounts and annual returns DESTINY CHRISTIAN CENTRE MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1152510
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 January 2020 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 21 January 2020 82 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 03 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window