ST LEONARDS BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1150270
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 March 2020 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 March 2020 152 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 21 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 21 July 2017 On time Download