THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF MARKET BOSWORTH, CADEBY WITH SUTTON CHENEY AND CONGERSTONE

Charity number: 1150873
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Pamela Mary Tebbatt-Mills Trustee 30 April 2019 None on record
PETER ANTHONY CHARLES SMITH Trustee 13 February 2013 None on record
Tina Winterbottom Trustee 18 September 2018 None on record
ROBERT JOHN RICKARD Trustee 13 February 2013 None on record
COLLEEN PATRICIA ANNAN Trustee 13 February 2013 None on record
Rev Mark Sylvester Poskitt Chair 20 September 2016 None on record
ROBERT ASHTON LEAKE Trustee 26 April 2016
AIM FOR CHANGE Received: On time
JANE GLENNON Trustee 30 April 2015
THE DIXIE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
Fiona Irene Josephine Thurlow Frisby Trustee 30 April 2014 None on record
Seth Lewis Trustee 30 April 2019 None on record
JANET MARY HICKLIN Trustee 13 February 2013 None on record
Geoff Frisby Trustee 09 January 2014 None on record
Geoffrey Howard Blackburn Trustee 26 April 2016 None on record
Rev Ann Elizabeth Hall Trustee 21 January 2020 None on record
DAVID SURTEES Trustee 13 February 2013 None on record
Carina Alwynne Hurst Trustee 30 April 2015 None on record