THE BOULTER'S TO BRAY SWIM TRUST

Charity number: 1155159
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.82k £8.51k £8.44k £7.69k £0
Total expenditure £4.51k £5.69k £5.15k £5.58k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A