Financial history THE BRITISH OCCUPATIONAL HYGIENE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1150455
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.46m £1.66m £1.56m £980.44k £1.31m
Total expenditure £1.42m £1.47m £1.56m £1.42m £1.28m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £8.20k £2.76k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £9.20k £2.76k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.46m £1.66m £1.56m £978.49k £1.30m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £9.20k £0
Income - Investment £1.63k £1.71k £1.87k £1.08k £575
Income - Other £3.00k £3.00k £0 £872 £4.06k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.76k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.42m £1.47m £1.56m £1.42m £1.28m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £87.86k £82.28k £90.60k £105.39k £153.36k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0