Trustees ANTI-TRAFFICKING AND LABOUR EXPLOITATION UNIT (ATLEU) LIMITED

Charity number: 1151675
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PRAGNA PATEL Chair 17 April 2013
None on record
Neela Jane Stansfield Trustee 17 October 2017
None on record
Natalia Dawkins Trustee 25 July 2017
None on record
Lucy Anne Walford Trustee 23 May 2017
THE NANI HUYU CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Anitha Sundari Trustee 23 May 2017
None on record
Jennifer Gillian Craig Trustee 20 October 2015
None on record
THOMAS MARK ALFRED SYRETT Trustee 01 February 2013
None on record