NORTH HUDDERSFIELD LEARNING COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1151685
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 20 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 20 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 19 August 2020 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 06 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 21 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 19 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required