M3 PROJECT

Charity number: 1154113
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £262.02k £270.73k £302.64k £291.62k £265.55k
Total expenditure £266.40k £251.61k £315.34k £291.02k £299.64k
Income from government contracts £154.12k £211.52k £149.02k £128.40k £134.05k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A