PHAN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1154658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £13.24k £15.65k £17.91k £4.11k £21.61k
Total expenditure £4.45k £16.16k £10.84k £18.79k £33.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A