Financial history THE ALA GREEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1151195
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 10/01/2018 10/01/2019 10/01/2020 10/01/2021 10/01/2022
Total gross income £606.64k £566.23k £571.15k £4.60m £772.06k
Total expenditure £304.24k £313.80k £408.05k £429.84k £471.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £493.63k £451.88k £453.25k £4.46m £573.51k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £113.01k £114.36k £117.90k £140.90k £198.55k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £304.24k £313.80k £382.23k £403.90k £438.97k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £25.83k £25.95k £32.57k
Expenditure - Governance £29.14k £19.47k £19.80k £11.25k £15.18k
Expenditure - Grants institution £275.10k £294.33k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £6.03k £6.62k £8.99k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0