DANCESYNDROME

Charity number: 1152664
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £90.09k £119.89k £169.01k £202.55k £167.15k
Total expenditure £85.07k £117.31k £148.75k £186.72k £200.17k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.45k £48.06k £7.00k £48.18k N/A