Arthritis Support Leicestershire

Charity number: 1151899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Linda Kimberley-Brooks Trustee 01 November 2019 None on record
Pauline Townsend Trustee 12 February 2014 None on record
Cara Davidson Trustee 06 April 2017 None on record
Sonal Godhania Trustee 11 February 2015 None on record
MARGARET GREEN Trustee 16 February 2013 None on record
Conrad McEwan Chair 08 February 2017 None on record
Diana Osborn Trustee 06 April 2017
THE INNER WHEEL CLUB OF LUTTERWORTH BENEVOLENT FUND Received: On time
Mark Alfred Bentham Trustee 06 April 2017 None on record