BHUBESI PRIDE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1153069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 29 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 29 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 16 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 16 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 31 July 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 31 July 2018 1 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 27 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 27 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2015 27 January 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 27 January 2016 On time Download