BHUBESI PRIDE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1153069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £134.21k £186.95k £198.09k £300.37k £281.14k
Total expenditure £119.16k £158.30k £219.90k £270.69k £284.90k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A