SEFTON STARS BASKETBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1154271
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £32.67k £42.51k £26.84k £26.84k £14.62k
Total expenditure £36.14k £46.69k £27.92k £27.20k £8.23k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.00k £3.00k £3.00k £3.00k £9.00k