MID CHESHIRE FOODBANK LTD

Charity number: 1151705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RODGER KEITH SPURLING Chair 01 September 2017 None on record
Peter Graham Schofield Trustee 09 March 2020 None on record
Joanna Lenderyou Trustee 20 July 2020 None on record
Sarah Elizabeth Saward Trustee 11 June 2018 None on record
Nathanial Pardoe Trustee 12 October 2020 None on record
Joyce Ann Rafferty Trustee 20 October 2014 None on record