Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL FOR THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CHRISTOPHER, BOURNEMOUTH
Charity number: 1153390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV ANDY MCPHERSON | Chair | 03 August 2013 |
|
|||||||
Lindsay Beaumont | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
ALAN PERCIVAL TREGILGAS | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Sheila Margaret Gold Olsen | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Anthony Sparke | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Ingrid Moira Elizabeth Cooney | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Michael David Wyatt | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Patricia Fairbairn | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Karen Louise Barker | Trustee | 06 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Mark Inkpen | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Fred Stewart | Trustee | 09 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
ALAN CHARLES BENNET | Trustee | 09 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Janice Mary Price | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||
RICHARD ARMSTRONG | Trustee | 03 August 2013 |
|
|
||||||
PAT GILES | Trustee | 03 August 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.