Financial history REES FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1154019
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £255.49k £292.60k £341.23k £387.46k £496.83k
Total expenditure £263.68k £295.98k £313.40k £360.41k £486.90k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A