Financial history MARYLEBONE BANGLADESH SOCIETY LTD

Charity number: 1151593
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £167.53k £145.44k £180.00k £197.23k £239.90k
Total expenditure £164.39k £139.94k £163.72k £189.45k £179.70k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £16.93k N/A £26.36k £22.76k £136.77k