MEANWHILE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1151901
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £8.34k £2.50k £600 £325.09k £36.08k
Total expenditure £14.12k £19.67k £4.60k £224.47k £131.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £324.90k £35.00k