AL HAYAT LANGUAGES LIMITED

Charity number: 1152346
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £178.98k £143.13k £271.82k £280.88k £331.65k
Total expenditure £156.98k £212.05k £294.61k £261.50k £346.63k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £60.98k £246.61k