Financial history THE BIKE PROJECT

Charity number: 1152354
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £578.55k £717.48k £1.19m £1.77m £2.23m
Total expenditure £522.03k £729.43k £1.15m £1.76m £2.33m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £28.62k £43.92k £215.51k £22.71k £37.82k
Income - Donations and legacies £479.16k £539.03k £987.52k £1.37m £1.72m
Income - Other trading activities £99.39k £178.46k £19.34k £32.82k £53.74k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £186.69k £371.06k £458.27k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £344.05k £432.88k £1.06m £710.22k £1.99m
Expenditure - Raising funds £177.98k £296.56k £79.26k £243.57k £337.07k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £8.97k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £10.67k £809.57k £0