Financial history AKO FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1151815
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £8.90m £40.21m £49.97m £439.77m £268.46m
Total expenditure £9.98m £25.59m £27.04m £23.63m £41.12m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £8.90m £40.20m £49.97m £302.39m £27.36m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.96k £3.48k £4.97k £2.00k £11.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £137.38m £241.09m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.98m £25.59m £27.04m £23.63m £41.12m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £10.56k £116.00k £37.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £25.59m £27.00m £23.29m £40.89m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0