Financial history EAST SUSSEX PROFICIENCY TESTS COMMITTEE LIMITED

Charity number: 1151348
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £90.10k £104.81k £73.36k £55.97k £27.15k
Total expenditure £108.29k £105.01k £70.79k £58.94k £33.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A