Financial history HEALTHWATCH SHROPSHIRE

Charity number: 1151343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £226.37k £224.26k £203.54k £161.85k £170.50k
Total expenditure £234.98k £213.34k £185.55k £167.03k £152.12k
Income from government contracts £223.49k £223.05k £163.25k £161.85k £162.00k
Income from government grants £0 £300 £40.04k N/A £6.50k