Dogfen lywodraethu HEALTHWATCH SHROPSHIRE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/02/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/03/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 DEC 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 SEP 2018 as amended on 01 Dec 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY: (A) PROVIDING INFORMATION AND ADVICE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC ABOUT LOCAL HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE SERVICES; (B) MAKING THE VIEWS AND EXPERIENCES OF MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC KNOWN TO HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE PROVIDERS; (C) ENABLING LOCAL PEOPLE TO HAVE A VOICE IN THE DEVELOPMENT, DELIVERY AND EQUALITY OF ACCESS TO LOCAL HEALTH AND CARE SERVICES AND FACILITIES AND; (D) PROVIDING TRAINING AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF SKILLS FOR VOLUNTEERS AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY IN UNDERSTANDING, SCRUTINIZING, REVIEWING AND MONITORING LOCAL HEALTH AND CARE SERVICES AND FACILITIES.
Maes buddion
SHROPSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.