Trustees HEALTHWATCH SHROPSHIRE

Charity number: 1151343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Vanessa Jayne Barrett Chair 14 October 2013
None on record
Mark Andrew Lacey Trustee 23 March 2022
THE WHITCHURCH WATERWAY TRUST
Received: On time
Denise Anne Walker Trustee 28 February 2019
None on record
Robert Welch Trustee 23 May 2017
None on record
STEVEN JOHN PRICE Trustee 22 February 2016
None on record
FREDERICK DAVID VOYSEY Trustee 16 May 2014
None on record
Anne Louise Wignall Trustee 24 March 2014
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS SHROPSHIRE BRANCH
Received: On time
Michael Terence Harte Trustee 24 March 2014
None on record