LOUTH SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 503540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 15 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required