STREAM SKILLS ADVANCEMENT LTD

Charity number: 1152803
Charity reporting is overdue by 36 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £3.60k £4.80k £4.60k £18.45k £2.09k
Total expenditure £4.00k £4.80k £9.35k £18.42k £1.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A