Trustees INTERNATIONAL SPINAL RESEARCH TRUST

Charity number: 1151015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR R SHELTON Chair 27 February 2013
BOYLE AND PETYT FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Dr David Judd Baxter Trustee 17 March 2022
None on record
Professor Sue Smith Trustee 09 February 2022
None on record
Professor Robert Brownstone Trustee 21 July 2021
None on record
Tara Howell Trustee 20 July 2020
None on record
Matthew Reeve Trustee 15 April 2019
None on record
His Honour Peter Charles Benson Trustee 21 January 2019
None on record
Ian Curtis Trustee 22 June 2015
None on record
MISS E F BLOIS Trustee 27 February 2013
ST. PETER'S EATON SQUARE PRIMARY SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time