Trustees THE SHEBA PROJECT LTD

Charity number: 1151496
Charity reporting is overdue by 387 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HAMMAD AHMED Chair 03 April 2013
None on record
Jonathan Michael Walker Trustee 26 November 2016
None on record
Layla Begum Trustee 27 January 2014
None on record
Saira Sikdaka Trustee 27 January 2014
None on record
Jahangir Hussain Trustee 01 November 2013
None on record
RASHIDA ALI Trustee 26 February 2013
None on record