FRIENDS OF ST ALKMUND'S WHITCHURCH

Charity number: 1151968
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £25.25k £6.96k £6.85k £3.49k £3.98k
Total expenditure £19.31k £2.04k £5.10k £11.03k £276
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A