SOUTH KERRIER HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1151834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £124.06k £100.78k £112.68k £160.96k £270.32k
Total expenditure £119.99k £101.12k £111.66k £159.53k £253.00k
Income from government contracts £45.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.31k £45.00k £30.00k £45.00k £82.39k