Financial history HIGHFIELD MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity number: 503619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £10.53k £10.74k £9.91k £4.82k £7.07k
Total expenditure £10.59k £9.78k £10.96k £2.41k £1.67k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A